Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Castellanos, Mayling, State Of Florida Department Of, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Merrill, Randy Edward, against Hernandez Andreu, Alexei A, represented by Batista, Alberto Victor, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY LONG DISTANCE PARENTING PLAN AND SUPPLEMENTAL PARENTING TIME | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served ALEXEI A HERNANDEZ-ANDREU (08-23-22) | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF FILED | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 262022DR000359DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2022 | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Cover Sheet | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Demographic Information Sheet | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.