Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sanchez, Beatrice Banda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Skinner, Darryon Mortarice, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE (RECORDED) | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED (DARRYON SKINNER) | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE FILED | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Event NJTR scheduled on 11/9/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $120.00 | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2023007570 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INIDIGENT STATUS (PETITIONER/ FOR MEDIATION PURPOSES) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.