Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gonzalez Rodriguez, Delma, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzalez Rodriguez, Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $21.00 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $21.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $21.00 Receipt Number MX 2023000297 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $21.00 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $21.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $21.00 Receipt Number MX 2022010914 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 10/2/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE SET FOR 10/2/22 @ 10 | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CERT OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS (DELMA GONZALEZ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.