Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rivera, Sonia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Montgomery, Thomas, against Maiquez, Amaury, Rivera, Orlando, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING AND DIRECTING SCHEDULED MEDIATION | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Other MEDIATION FEE | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.