Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Vazquez, Edilberto, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Montgomery, Thomas, against Vazquez, Consuelo, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 14, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RESPONDENT WIFES MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS FILED | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HR scheduled on 12/14/2023 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding. | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENTS/WIFE'S MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PETITIONER/HUSBAND'S (SIXTH) NOTICE TO PRODUCE AUGUST 24, 2023 | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.