Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Career Financial Corp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Macia, Alberto Antonio, against D Orra, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: June 17, 2022COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: June 17, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUSAN D'ORRA (NV)
Date: June 17, 2022Return of Service Served SUSAN D'ORRA ON 6/22/2022
Date: June 27, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUSAN D'ORRA (CA)
Date: June 17, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED
Date: June 21, 2022Return of Service Unserved SUSAN D'ORRA
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT *EMAILED TO ATTY*
Date: July 14, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE RECORDED
Date: July 19, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE RECORDED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT *EMAILED TO ATTY* | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Unserved SUSAN D'ORRA | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served SUSAN D'ORRA ON 6/22/2022 | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006131 | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.