Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
South Florida Ops Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Poliakoff, Payton William Henry, against Board Of County Commissioners, Hendry County Florida, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: June 01, 2022COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT
Date: June 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HENDRY COUNTY, FLORIDA
Date: June 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF HENDRY COUNTY
Date: June 02, 2022Return of Service Served HENDRY COUNTY, FL ON 6/6/2022
Date: June 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF HENDRY COUNTY ON 6/6/2022 | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served HENDRY COUNTY, FL ON 6/6/2022 | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HENDRY COUNTY, FLORIDA | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF HENDRY COUNTY | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005448 | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 262022CA000303CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/1/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.