Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Career Financial Corp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Macia, Alberto Antonio, against Irby, Lucy, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: May 23, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LUCY IRBY
Date: May 23, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: June 23, 2022Return of Service Unserved LUCY IRBY
Date: June 19, 2022SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: June 22, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: May 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 21, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT *EMAILED TO ATTY*
Date: August 02, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE (LUCY IRBY)
Date: August 03, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*
Date: June 22, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE RECORDED
Date: August 08, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE RECORDED | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE (LUCY IRBY) | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT *EMAILED TO ATTY* | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.