Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lopez, Jean A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lopez, Schuana L, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DOM CASES FILED (JEAN A LOPEZ) | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Other - RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PARTIES' AMENDED EXECUTED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (AMENDED TO INCLUDE "EXHIBIT A") | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.