Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Reverse Mortgage Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Clyde Johnson Contracting And, in the jurisdiction of Hendry County, FL, . Hendry County, FL Superior Courts with SLOAN, JAMES DEAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLOAN, JAMES DEAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resid $50,001-249,000 |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHendry County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED
Date: October 31, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED
Date: October 31, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 31, 2019COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: October 31, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED CLYDE JOHNSON CONTRACTING & ROOFING INC
Date: October 31, 2019Return of Service Served CLYDE JOHNSON- ON 11-15-19
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served CLYDE JOHNSON- ON 11-15-19 | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $925.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $925.00 Receipt Number MX 2019013821 | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 262019CA000764CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.