Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Saeed, Aamir Hayat, against Buenrostro, Jasinto J, Salgado, Noemi, Unknown Tenant In Possession O, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with OJEDA, REINALDO JUAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2023 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resid $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS SUB SERVED ON 2-6-23
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING FOR OCTOBER 16, 2023 AT 1:30PM
Date: September 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS SUB- SERVED ON 2-6-23
Date: February 14, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSE **SALE DATE 11-22-23
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: October 12, 2023MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE JAN, 24, 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 16, 2024CIVIL TRANSMITTAL SHEET
Date: February 08, 2024MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE THE NOVEMBER 22, 2023 FORECLOSURE SALE (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION NOTCE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 09, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT AS TO COST
Date: October 12, 2023MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE JAN. 24, 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: January 16, 2024CIVIL TRANSMITTAL SHEET
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: April 16, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASINTO J. BUENROSTRO
Date: January 20, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO NOEMI SALGADO
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE **SALE SET FOR FEB. 21, 2024
Date: January 18, 2024PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER
Date: January 18, 2024FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 20, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT **DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET 7/19/23 @ 9:45AM
Date: July 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 16, 2024VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 20, 2023COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY
Date: April 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 17, 2024CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 03, 2023MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE THE FEBRUARY 21, 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE (PLAINTIFF')
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 7-19-23 AT 945 AM
Date: June 28, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR APRIL 24, 2024 AT 11:00AM
Date: February 01, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 08, 2024PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 12, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY
Date: January 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE **NOT SERVED** ON ON SUMMONS, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS NON-SERVED ON 2-6-23
Date: February 14, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORGINAL NOTE
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: May 12, 2023PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER
Date: January 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL APRIL 24 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE DISSOLVE THE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL APRIL 24 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE DISSOLVE THE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCU | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL APRIL 24 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PRDJUDICE DISSOLVE THE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS(PLAINTIFF'S) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL TRANSMITTAL SHEET | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE THE FEBRUARY 21, 2024 FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR APRIL 24, 2024 AT 11:00AM | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.