Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garza, Johnny, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garza, Edna L, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT. SEE FOR DETAILS | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE **SENT TO HCSO | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS FILED BY KARIE SANOBA FOR PETITIONER | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event FINAL HEARING on 12/16/2022 0900 AM Judge DAVID HORTON results HEARING CANCELLED on 12/15/2022 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 12/30/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.