Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garza, Dianna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rosales, Alyssa Jacklyn, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with OJEDA, REINALDO JUAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2047 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER, GRANTED, SIGNED BY JUDGE 5/2/2023 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DBJ | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTE: ON 2/21/2023 NEW PETITION FOR SUPERSEDING ORDER FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER WAS FILED IN 2023DR00068 BY DOR/CSE | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 3/27/23 AT 1PM | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event PETITION scheduled on 3/27/2023 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge MAGISTRATE CHILD SUPPORT presiding. | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 3/27/2023 AT 1PM ON AMENDED PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.