Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Smith, Robert A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Prestridge, Tabatha M., in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED: ON SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF FOR ROBERT SMITH 10-22-23 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED: ON SUPPLEMETAL FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF FOR TABATHA PRESTRIDGE UNABLE TO FORWARD ON10-20-23 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED: ON NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TABATHA M PRESTRIDGE UNABLE TO FORWARD 7/5/23 | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2034 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENT EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION COURSE- ROBERT SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.