Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event FINAL HEARING on 1/20/2023 0900 AM Judge DAVID HORTON results HEARING CANCELLED on 1/13/2023 | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN (AFTER NOTICE) | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL TRANSMITTAL SHEET | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR TEMPORARY INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESSTIC VIOLENCE SHAWN NORWOOD SERVED ON 10/20/22 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED AS TO LOCATION OF VISITATION AND TEMORARY USE OF HOME FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE **SENT TO HCSO** **MAILED TO PETITIONER** | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH CHILDREN | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL TRANSMITTAL SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.