Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Basey, Christopher S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Basey, Brandi J, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2033 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE W/MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FINAL PARENTING PLAN ORDER ATTACHED AS COMPOSITE EXHIBIT 1 | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING WIFE'S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION FILED BY HUSBAND | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING VIRTUAL FINAL HEARING ON 11-30-22 AT 2PM | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 11/30/2022 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge MICHAEL RAIDEN presiding. | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE & WAIVER FROM RESPONDENT OF DEFENSES TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BASED ON TERMS OF MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.