Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goodwin, Ashley Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzalez, Jose Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with OJEDA, REINALDO JUAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE : PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2029 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: OJEDA , REINALDO Assigned | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE **NOT SERVED** ON 10/24/2022 BY HARDEE CO SHERIFF | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE **NOT SERVED** ON SUMMONS WAS NOT SERVED TO JOSE GONZALEZ ON 11-07-2022 BY POLK COUNTY SHERIFF | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE **NOT SERVED** ON | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE **NOT SERVED** ON JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ, SUMMONS AND PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT **emailed to CSE@SAO10.COM** | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS : ALIAS SUMMONS FOR JOSE ALBERTO GONZALEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.