Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
George, Kristine Michele, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morris, Kevin Deon, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with OJEDA, REINALDO JUAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED STATEMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY W/E-FILING PORTAL CONFIRMATION | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2048 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY AND SUPPORT W/FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF HEARING OFFICER AND SCHEDULE "A" IS ATTACHED AND INCORP, SIGNED BY JUDGE MAY 2, 2023 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FLORIDA ADDENDUM TO INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET FILED | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DBJ | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.