Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alvarez, Octavio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vaughn, Ciara Leann, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 7/5/2022 at 0145 PM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding. | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET 7/5/22 @ 1:45PM FOR DISSOLUTION | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PHONE CALL: SPOKE W/PETITIONER RE: PARENTING CLASS, HE ADVISED HE FILED IT, AFTER REVEIWING DOCUMENTS FILED IT HAD BEEN MAINTAINED AS THE PARENTING PLAN, CERTIFICATE OF PARENTING WAS FILED 3/9/22 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE: NEED PARENTING CERTIFICATE BEFORE HEARING WILL BE SET | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.