Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Horton, David Neal filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcclelland, Ira Nain, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event FINAL HEARING on 3/11/2022 0900 AM Judge DAVID HORTON results HEARING CANCELLED on 3/8/2022 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON ORDER SETTING HEARING SERVED ON 3-3-22 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR INJUNCTION | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR INJUNCTION **SENT TO JUDGE | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAILED ORDER SETTING TO PETITIONER. | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: HORTON , DAVID assigned | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 252022DR000067DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.