Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Delarosa, Cynthia N, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sanchez, Sanders, Alexander Eligah, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | INFORMATION UPDATE FORM | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PHONE CALL: FOR PETITIONER CALLED IN SHE CAN NOT GET INTO THE CASE SENT TO CA | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY SERVED ALEXANDER ELIGAH SANDERS ON 03-10-2022 | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT / ENTERED | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.