Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Aguirre, Maria E., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Abuchaibe, Jeanette Cristina, against Mancillas, Ismael Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF FINAL INJUCTION | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTIONFOR PROTECTION ***SENT TO JUDGE W/ORDER FOR SIGNATURE | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE AMENDMENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION SERVED ON 4-28-22 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO FINAL INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE **SPOKE TO PETITTIONER TO INFORM THAT IT WAS GRANTED. ***SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Reclose | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for 2 Other on 4/21/2022 | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Case Reopen | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL INJUNCTION **SENT TO JUDGE | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FINAL JUDGMENT SERVED ON 2-25-22 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.