Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Satterfield, James B, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Satterfield, Josephine, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT UNCONNECTED WITH DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Event PETITION scheduled on 3/2/2022 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge MICHAEL RAIDEN presiding. | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 3/2/22 @ 3PM FOR PETITION FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000484 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 252022DR000039DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/27/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.