Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nuccio, Lisa Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gardner, Christopher James, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2027 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER/DRIVER'S LICENSE REINSTATEMENT FROM 03/28/2022, SIGNED BY JUDGE 04/21/2022 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUEST GRANTED BY HEARING OFFICER TO BE BY PHONE OR ZOOM | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST BY FAX TO HEARING OFFICER FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR 03/28/2022 CRT | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER FILED BY SAO/CSE | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL FOR 03/28/2022 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE AT ISSUE | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.