Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Williams, Alex Levi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Justin Lane, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2027 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SERVED ON 11-22-21 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: HORTON , DAVID assigned | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 252021DR000407DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 12/3/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding. | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S OFFICE COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.