Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nuccio, Lisa Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nuccio, Christopher Jared, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2032 | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN(UNCONTESTED) SIGNED BY JUDGE 01252022 | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 1/25/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding. | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE 20 DAY SUMMONS SERVED ON 11-16-21 **ROS WAS SCANNED INTO WRONG CASE NUMBER | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: HORTON , DAVID assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.