Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nava, John Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nava, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with HORTON, DAVID NEAL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2027 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PARENTING PLAN ATTACHED AND INCORP SIGNED BY JUDGE 02252022 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 02/22/2022 AT 9:30AM | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING scheduled on 2/22/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding. | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FOR PARENTING CLASS FOR HUSBAND & WIFE | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PHONE CALL: SPOKE WITH ASHLEY AND ADVISED HER THAT WE NEED THE PARENTING CERTIFICATE, CALLED JOHN & LEFT A MESSAGE THAT WE NEED THE PARENTING CERTIFICATE BEFORE A HEARING CAN BE SET | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: HORTON , DAVID assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.