Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rodriguez, Raynaldo Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Santellan, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM, COPY EFILED TO BVS | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PHONE CALL: FROM DALE INQUIRING ABOUT THE ATTORNEY NOT BEING ABLE TO SEE THE FJ, THEY WHERE ADVISIED TO REGISTER ON THE CLERK'S WEBSITE. LF | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITIONER'S VERIFIED PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND ESTABLISH A PARENTING PLAN AND TIMESHARING ARRANGEMENT AND FOR OTHER RELATED RELIEF WITH PARENTING PLAN MODEL 2 ATTACHED | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2028 | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Type changed to TRIAL for 4/27/2022 at 0100 PM | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING TRIAL SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING SET 4/27/22 @ 1PM FOR PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY & ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event PETITION scheduled on 4/27/2022 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge MICHAEL RAIDEN presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.