Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carte, Jessica L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carte, Kyle M., in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PHONE CALL: KYLES MOM CALLED ASKING ABOUT INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER AND KYLE CHANGING JOBS. LA | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $120.00 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2023005921 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF MEDIATION SERVICES FEE | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION & TERMINATION OF APPEARANCE FROM ATTY TERESA CORDOBA | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2032 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE INCORPORATING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ASEXHIBIT A AND CHILD SUPP GUIDELINES AS EXHIBIT 2 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.