Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rodriguez, Jose Luis, Rodriquez, Jose Luis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Apolonia Mercedes, in the jurisdiction of Hardee County, FL, . Hardee County, FL Superior Courts with RAIDEN, MICHAEL E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHardee County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SHEET-JUDGE IS LEAVING CHILDREN W/FATHER | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING EMERGENCY PLACEMENT | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JANUARY 2032 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED APOLONIA MARTINEZ ON 10/18/21 | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE IN PRO SE BOX | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ORDER TO PICK UP MINOR ***UNEXECUTED**** | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: RAIDEN , MICHAEL E assigned | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 252021DR000358DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/13/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.