Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sosa, Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | 20 Day Collection Notice | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.