Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Shuler, Wylnskia Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Oliver, Sirmyra, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO MR. SHULER | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SIRMYRA OLIVER ON 8/24/23 | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH EXHIBITS - SIRMYRA OLIVER | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ACSO FOR SERVICE | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 242023DR000148DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/17/2023 | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISESTABLISH PATERNITY | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF FLORIDA DL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.