Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Johnson, Destiny, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Young, Chauncey, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT/NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT/INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 242023DR000128DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/24/2023 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.