Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Daniels, Julie, Mcdaniel, Julie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcdaniel, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (RECORDED FJ WITH THE ATTACHMENTS) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 8/23/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY RESPONDENT | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JUSTIN MCDANIEL | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.