Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Norris, James Alan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Norris, Doris Amelia, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 7/12/2023 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING - 7/12/23 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: KOBERLEIN JR, FRED assigned | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 242023DR000079DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/4/2023 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 56644 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.