Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Udell, Douglas M, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN, FRED JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2023 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 56700 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: KOBERLEIN JR, FRED Assigned | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 242023CP000027CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/3/2023 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.