Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Allied First Bank Sb, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Saeed, Aamir Hayat, against Parr, Dustin S, Unknown Spouse Of Dustin S Par, Unknown Tenant In Possession O, U S Bank Trust National Associ, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
AMENDED THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: June 28, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 28, 2023VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2023RETURN OF UNSERVED SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DUSTIN S PARR
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED- CORPORATE SERVICE KEN HOLBERT
Date: July 27, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: June 28, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF FILING AND FILING ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: June 28, 2023MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULTS
Date: August 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DUSTIN S PARR A/K/A DUSTIN SHANE PARR ON 07/13/2023
Date: July 27, 2023DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: August 21, 2023NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: August 21, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: November 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Unknown Spouse Of Dustin S Parr dismissed 12/4/2023 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Proper dismissed 12/4/2023 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 1/10/2024 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge SAMUEL PERRONE presiding. | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULTS | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.