Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank Trust National Associa, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Howard, Harris Seth, against Town Of White Springs Florida, Unknown Spouse Of Bernard L Wi, Unknown Spouse Of Ruby T Willi, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RUBY WILLIAMS
Date: May 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED BERNARD WILLIAMS
Date: May 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: May 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: May 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED TOWN OF WHITE SPRINGS FLORIDA
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 30, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BERNARD WILLIAMS
Date: May 25, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: June 01, 2023MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES AS DEFENDANTS
Date: June 05, 2023NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 05, 2023OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE MAGISTRATE
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: August 22, 2023OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: August 22, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 30, 2023PLAINTIFF 'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING COMPLETE COPY OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: September 05, 2023ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND REFERRING CASE BACK TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
Date: October 17, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 19, 2023RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RUBY WILLIAMS
Date: October 25, 2023PLAINTIFF 'S REPLY TO AND AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANT, RUBY T. WILLIAMS', ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 25, 2023DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: October 30, 2023PLAINTIFF 'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: November 30, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: December 12, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 12, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Date: December 14, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 28, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: April 28, 2023THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: April 28, 2023VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: April 28, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED RUBY WILLIAMS ON 5/11/23
Date: May 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING - CA scheduled on 1/24/2024 at 0430 PM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING - CA scheduled on 2/26/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge FRED KOBERLEIN JR presiding. | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE MOTION TO COMPEL PROPER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, RUBY T. WILLIAMS TO ITS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.