Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davenport, John Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harvey, Pat, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with PAUL BRYAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedJune 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM- JUDGE BRYAN PRESIDING | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Event IH scheduled on 5/31/2022 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE WITHOUT ISSUANCE OF AN INTERIM TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & GIVEN TO PETITIONER | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons disposition on 5/27/2022 | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 5/27/22 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: SCAFF , SONNY assigned | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 242022DR000081DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/26/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.