Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Greenberg, Alisha Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Greenberg, Aaron Isadore, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) - 6/30/22 AT 9AM | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 6/30/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - AARON GREENBERG | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.