Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dampier, Casey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dampier, Joe Elbert Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MINUTES | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event IH on 3/1/2022 1130 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results DISPOSED on 3/1/2022 | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | UPDATED INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; CERT COPIES SENT TO HCSO & MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) TEMP ON 2/17/22 | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | FIREARMS STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Active Process Civil Summons disposition on 2/17/2022 | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 242022DR000024DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/16/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.