Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gandy, Jessie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gandy, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 7/28/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) - 7/28/2022 AT 9AM | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOTE MEDIATION - 05/26/2022 AT 11:00AM | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 50563 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.