Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smith, Vaneshia V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - VANESHIA SMITH - RETURN TO SENDER NO MAIL RECEPTABLE - SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AFTER FINAL JUDGMENT | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AFTER FINAL JUDGMENT: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (05/19/22) | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE BRYAN - V. SMITH | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | State Attorney Case Number modified: ] | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING - DR scheduled on 5/19/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - V. SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.