Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Henderson, Lasasha, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Brown, Thomas Joseph, against Pena, Yarlo Javier Lara, Rodriguez, Yonier, Ydm Transport Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 13, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND PROCEED TO SERVE
Date: June 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND PROCEED TO SERVE | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 51357 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $400.00 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 242022CA000047CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2022 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 51306 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.