Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Societ, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Dixon, Audrey Jayne, against Aldridge, Glen, Aldridge, Shirley, Glen Aldridge, Unknown Spouse, Shirley Aldridge, Unknown Spou, Tenant 1, Unknown, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 05, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: May 05, 2022MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND PROCEED TO SERVE
Date: May 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHRLEY ALDRIDGE 5/21/2022 AT 9:57AM
Date: May 25, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 18, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED GLEN ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/2022 AT 9:55AM
Date: May 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 25, 2022DEFAULT ISSUED
Date: July 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF S. ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/2022 AT
Date: May 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF G. ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 25, 2022PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GLEN ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/22
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHRILEY ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/2022
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - SERVED GLEN ALDRIDGE ON 05/21/2022 AT 9:55PM
Date: May 26, 2022ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - SERVED SHIRLEY ALDRIDGE ON 5/21/22 AT 9:57AM
Date: May 26, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: July 12, 2022VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: August 11, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SHIRLEY ALDRIDGE dismissed 8/11/2022 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | GLEN ALDRIDGE dismissed 8/11/2022 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHIRLEY ALDRIDGE dismissed 7/12/2022 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | UNKNOWN TENANT 1 dismissed 7/12/2022 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.