Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Chin-Duncan, Karissa, against Cellon, Frank Martin, Hunt, Ashley Danielle, Tenant 1, Unknown, Tenant 2, Unknown, United States Of America, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN, FRED JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Reverse Mortgage Funding LLC against various defendants. The action seeks to foreclose a reverse mortgage on real property located in Hamilton County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that it is entitled ...
NOTICE OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 18, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: March 29, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: March 29, 2022ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND PROCEED TO SERVE
Date: April 01, 2022COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: March 29, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 29, 2022CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION
Date: March 29, 2022THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: April 07, 2022ANSWER -CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: April 20, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ON 04/14/2022
Date: April 14, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 04/14/2022
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED ASHLEY HUNT ON 4/15/22
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOW TENANT 1 ON 04/14/2022
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 04/14/2022
Date: April 29, 2022DIRECTIONS TO CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT - MAILING COMPLETE
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FRANK CELLON ON 4/27/22
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE - SERVED FRANK CELLON ON 04/28/2022 AT 12:30PM
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ASHLEY HUNT ON 4/15/22
Date: April 29, 2022SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION
Date: May 06, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION (REQUESTED TO BE MAILED)
Date: May 10, 2022RETURNED MAIL - UNKNOWN SPOUSE, HEIRS, ETC
Date: May 17, 2022MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 09-29-2022 @ 3:00 P.M. - ZOOM
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT(S)
Date: July 15, 2022ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY AS DEFENDANT
Date: July 18, 2022RETURNED MAIL - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF D. HUNT;KIRK LAUGHTER
Date: August 11, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JILL BUNKER
Date: October 04, 2022RETURNED MAIL - ASHLEY HUNT
Date: August 11, 2022RETURNED MAIL - A. HUNT
Date: September 06, 2022CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/29/2022 AT 3:45PM
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED JILL BUNKER ON 10/17/22 AT 9AM
Date: October 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON JILL BUNKER
Date: October 04, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JILL ANNIE BUNKER ON 10/27/22 AT 9AM
Date: October 28, 2022ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: June 13, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: February 07, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTERING DEFAULT
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022FORECLOSURE BID SHEET
Date: June 14, 2023ORDERSCHEDULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING - 3/22/23 AT 9AM
Date: February 07, 2023RETURNED MAIL -UNK. SPOUSE, HEIRS, THE ESTATE OF SUDYE CAUTHEN, DECEASED
Date: February 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: June 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS - ORIGINALS PLACED IN CASE FILE IN OFFICE
Date: March 15, 2023IN REM FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: May 08, 2023GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION(S) - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 31, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 13, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: June 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 8 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 8 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $100.00 Receipt Number MX 57319 | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE BID SHEET | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.