Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hammock, A'Lyssa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hammock, Clint Steven Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 6/30/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) - 6/30/2022 AT 9AM | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $120.00 | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 50510 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT AND COPIES OF PAY STUBSS OF RESPONDENT | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.