Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peebles, Donna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bowen, John William Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM PETITIONER | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event IH on 1/24/2022 1100 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results DISPOSED on 12/28/2021 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIRE TO WITHDRAW PETITION FOR INJUNTION BY PETITIONER | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY HAND DELIVERED TO PETITIONER | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MINUTES | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) CONTINUANCE ON 12/9/21 | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | UPDATED INFORMATION SHEETS | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CONTINUANCE OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PETITIONER | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event IH on 12/9/2021 1000 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results CONTINUED on 12/9/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.