Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Waddell, Hermisha Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adkins, Jamine Lonzaile Sr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOBERLEIN JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER FROM CONTEMPT HEARING | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT, NOTICE OF HEARING AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Einforcement on 7/21/2023 | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING - DR scheduled on 9/11/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge STEVEN JOHNSON presiding. | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.