Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Pittman, Shamere Rochelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bartholomew, Rodney B, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SDU NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS - S. PITTMAN | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT STATEMENT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | GENETIC TISSUE TESTING RESULTS | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT/INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE PATERNITY AND SUPPORT ORDER | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 242021DR000196DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/13/2021 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.